Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 899 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14305 Week
» 67321 Month
» 186848 Year
» 3213701 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1272 |
m/e |
10/1905 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4272 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8871 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
68871 |
m/e |
05/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
242 |
Works Number |
1088 |
To Service |
During 10/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 10/02/1958 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 4 mths , 11 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1905 |
ARD |
|
Ardsley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
38A |
|
Colwick |
5w/e |
21/01/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/02/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/02/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1272 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1088 |
|
|
05/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4272 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8871 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
05/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68871 |
|
|
21/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
10/02/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68871 |
|
|