Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 4050 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17456 Week
» 70472 Month
» 189999 Year
» 3216852 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1285 |
m/e |
01/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4285 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8884 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68884 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
257 |
Works Number |
1220 |
To Service |
During 01/1909 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 14/09/1955 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 8 mths , 14 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1909 |
KX |
|
Kings Cross |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
35A |
|
New England |
4w/e |
19/09/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/09/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
35A |
New England |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/09/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1285 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1220 |
|
|
11/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4285 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8884 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68884 |
|
|
19/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
14/09/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68884 |
|
|