|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1952 | Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) | Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). | SLS/195206 |
29/06/1958 | Stratford MPD | On 29th June, the following were awaiting scrap-62536/80, 62788/97, 65442, 65508/34/5/74, 67195/212/27/30/1, 68490/1/4/5/546/55/68/607/32. In the previous week, 69496, 69609/43 were cut up. | SLS/195807 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1890 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 331 Built at Stratford Works |
||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7331 | ||
09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8494 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Kings Lynn (KL) | ||
03/1951 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 68494 | ||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
21/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
22/08/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to South Lynn (31D) | ||
08/04/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68494 | ||
08/1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped |