Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 905 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18708 Week
» 71724 Month
» 191251 Year
» 3218104 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
363 |
m/e |
05/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7363 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8540 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68540 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
R29 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 05/1892 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 16/01/1956 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 8 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1956 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
EXLOAN |
40A |
Lincoln |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
ALLOC |
34D |
Hitchin (GNR) |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/01/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1929 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
09/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
09/1929 |
Condensers removed |
09/1929 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1892 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 363 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7363 |
|
|
09/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
09/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
09/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8540 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68540 |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
22/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
16/01/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68540 |
|
|