Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 996 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18799 Week
» 71815 Month
» 191342 Year
» 3218195 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
369 |
m/e |
04/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7369 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8545 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
68545 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
N33 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 04/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 03/02/1961 |
Service Life |
66 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
KL |
Kings Lynn |
4w/e |
22/01/1949 |
ALLOC |
31D |
South Lynn |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
ALLOC |
40A |
Lincoln |
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
ALLOC |
40E |
Colwick |
4w/e |
21/02/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
03/02/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1929 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
08/1929 |
Condensers removed |
08/1929 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
06/1937 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 369 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7369 |
|
|
08/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
08/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
06/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8545 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68545 |
|
|
22/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (KL) |
|
|
16/08/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
31/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
02/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
03/02/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68545 |
|
|