|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/06/1948 | Cowlairs Works (Erecting Shop) | Locomotives in the yard awaiting repair were Nos. 502, 1745, 2436/39, 4532, 4600, 4791, 5237, 5913, 8118, 8350, 8955, 9178, 9503/11, 61002 an 61735-the last two being lettered B.R. Locomotives in the Works were: Stripping Pit Nos. 1102, 9927; Erecting Shop Nos. 1116, 1774/75/77/92/94, 1885, 1916/95, 2686/90, 4524/50/60/89, 4821, 7492, 8567, 9126/45, 61767; Steaming Pits Nos. 1787, 4925, 61134, 61292, 69206; Paint Shop Nos. 1101, 1783. 61292 is fitted with ex L.M.S. tablet catcher and is to be used on Perth-Inverness trials. | SLS/194808 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1896 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 391 Built at Stratford Works |
||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7391 | ||
01/1924 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
1932 | Modification | Modification: Condensers removed | ||
11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8567 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD) | ||
06/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 68567 | ||
10/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
16/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
22/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
22/08/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
24/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) | ||
20/02/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
22/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to South Lynn (31D) | ||
18/02/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
18/08/1957 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68567 | ||
09/1957 | Scrapped | Scrapped |