Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2883 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16289 Week
» 69305 Month
» 188832 Year
» 3215685 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
264 |
m/e |
04/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7264 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8590 |
on |
16/03/1946 |
British Railways |
68590 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
H45 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 29/09/1955 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 5 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1955 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1899 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/09/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
38D |
Staveley (G.C.) |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
01/01/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/09/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 264 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7264 |
|
|
16/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8590 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68590 |
|
|
1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
29/09/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68590 |
|
|