Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2597 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16003 Week
» 69019 Month
» 188546 Year
» 3215399 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
35E |
m/e |
10/1923 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7035 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8661 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68661 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
J68 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
I89 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 10/1923 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 18/12/1959 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1936 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1923 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 35E Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7035 |
|
|
06/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8661 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68661 |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
18/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
18/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68661 |
|
|
01/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|