Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 4873 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20485 Week
» 119130 Month
» 321794 Year
» 3348647 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
51 |
m/e |
05/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7051 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8617 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
68617 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J69 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
S56 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 05/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/07/1958 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1958 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1904 |
STR |
|
Stratford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
38D |
|
Staveley (G.C.) |
5w/e |
21/01/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/07/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
38D |
Staveley (G.C.) |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/07/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1927 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
12/1927 |
Condensers removed |
12/1927 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
05/1940 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 51 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7051 |
|
|
12/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
12/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
05/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8617 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68617 |
|
|
21/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) |
|
|
14/07/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68617 |
|
|
12/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|