|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1958 | Stratford Works (Waiting Cut Up) | Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 52 Built at Stratford Works |
||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7052 | ||
12/1927 | Modification | Modification: Condensers removed | ||
12/1927 | Modification | Modification: Steam Brakes fitted | ||
12/1927 | Modification | Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed | ||
09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8618 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Lincoln (LIN) | ||
11/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 68618 | ||
29/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
06/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
22/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
19/04/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
21/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
19/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
09/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
06/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
20/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
21/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
08/03/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
19/07/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
18/08/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68618 | ||
02/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |