|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/08/1947 | Eastfield MPD | On 24/8 the locos. on shed ex works were 'J39' 4923/33; 'J83' 8445 and 'J69' 8623, and further locos. ex works during August that have been noted here are: 'K2' 1757; 'J37' 4541/79/84, 4604/17/21; 'J39' 4711, 4818, 4929; 'C15' 7468; 'J88' 8345; 'J83' 8473 (green); 'N15' 9136/77 an 9222. | SLS/194710 |
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Scrap Road) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 57 Built at Stratford Works |
||
1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7057 | ||
10/1928 | Modification | Modification: Condensers removed | ||
10/1928 | Modification | Modification: Steam Brakes fitted | ||
10/1928 | Modification | Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed | ||
07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8623 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) | ||
04/1951 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 68623 | ||
21/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
28/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
22/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
17/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) | ||
22/08/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to South Lynn (31D) | ||
14/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) | ||
19/07/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
30/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
02/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
14/02/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 68623 |