Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2001 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19804 Week
» 72820 Month
» 192347 Year
» 3219200 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
82 |
m/e |
08/1904 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7082 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8628 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68628 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J67 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
P57 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 08/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 24/02/1958 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 6 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1958 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1932 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
09/1935 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 82 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7082 |
|
|
09/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
09/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8628 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Yarmouth South Town (YAR) |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68628 |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
15/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
24/02/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68628 |
|
|
03/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|