30/11/1946 |
General |
From 26th October, special football trains were again run on Saturdays to Northumberland Park from Chingford and N. Woolwich. The Woolwich turns so for have been in the hands of 7087 on 26/10, an 'F.4' on 9/11, and 7157 (7581) on 23/11 |
SLS/194701 |
30/11/1946 |
General |
An interesting double-headed train is the 5.30 p.m. Clacton, which daily leaves with any combination of 'D.16/2,' 'D.16/3,' 'B.12/3,' and 'B.17' at the head. Spitalflelds goods has not seen very many strangers, but 3806 (6601) was a change recently. 'F.3' are still seen at Liverpool Street; locos noted being 7139 (8067), 7148 (8047), 7149 (8048), and 8081, all on the Woodford line fairly regularly between the end of June till October. This line also has had 'V.1' 7675 working along it late Sept./Oct., together with various 0-6-0Ts such as 8575, 8612, 8613, and 8633. The Ilford line usually gets the 'J.68' such as 7043 25/9 and 7048 28/8, whilst even the sparse Fenchurch Street service comes in for its share (8538 noted 30/11). The most usual 'J.15' in Liverpool Street are:-7545/6/7/60/5/6, 7641/4/6 and 5453 (7555), and they usually turn up on Brentwood or Gidea Park trains |
SLS/194701 |
28/12/1960 |
Stratford Works (Old Works) |
Old Works: 12110 (30A), 12129 (34G), D2209 (31F), D2219 (32A), D2227 (30A), D2557 (32B), D3301 (30A), D3328 (31B), 65464 (30A), 68633 (for preservation). Diesel Sp.: 12106 (30A), D5030 (30A), D5036 (32B), D5053 (31B), D5067 (31B), D5095 (31B), D5906 (34G), D8202 (32A), D8203 (32A), D8401 (30A). Waiting Wks.: 65446 (30A), 65549 (31B), 65589 (31A). Foundry: 62613. On Shed Ex Wks.: 65361 (30A). Waiting Cutting-up: 65511, 67704/26, 68644. |
SLS/196102 |
11/02/1961 |
Stratford Works (Old Works) |
Old Works: D2227, D2572, D2950/3, D3300, 12127/9/32, 65453, 68633. New Erecting Shop: D202/8/48, D5029/36/44/69/70/95, D5533/46/89/92/4, D5664, D5900/2/3/9, D8204, D8403-6. |
SLS/196104 |
31/07/1961 |
Stratford Works (Old Works) |
Steam locomotives-Old Works: 68633; waiting cut-up 67726, 68924; foundry 68612, 69690 |
SLS/196109 |
31/12/1961 |
Restoration of Class J69 complete |
The work of restoration on Holden ex-G.E.R. Class J69 0-6-0T loco. 68633, which was scheduled for preservation when withdrawn from Stratford (30A) in November, 1960, was completed at Stratford Works last December and the loco. transferred by road to the Clapham Museum the following month. Constructed at Stratford Works as G.E.R. 87 in September, 1904, under Order No. S56, the loco. was successively renumbered L.N.E.R. 7087 in 1924, 8633 during April, 1946, and B.R. 68633 in December, 1948. Once again the Stratford staff have made a beautiful job of painting the loco. in the fully-lined Royal Blue livery. A stovepipe chimney, Westinghouse pumps and original style of low-roofed cab are fitted and G.E.R. 87 is a very worthy addition to the B.T.C's growing collection of preserved engines. |
SLS/196205 |