Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 328 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18131 Week
» 71147 Month
» 190674 Year
» 3217527 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
130 |
m/e |
04/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7130 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8220 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
68220 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J70 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
I67 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 04/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 23/02/1953 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 10 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1953 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
IFS |
|
w/e |
04/02/1950 |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
w/e |
28/05/1950 |
ALLOC |
32D |
Yarmouth South Town |
w/e |
25/02/1951 |
ALLOC |
32B |
Ipswich |
w/e |
05/05/1951 |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
ALLOC |
32B |
Ipswich |
w/e |
29/09/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/02/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 130 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7130 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8220 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Lynn (KL) |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
28/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68220 |
|
|
25/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
05/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
07/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
29/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
23/02/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68220 |
|
|
03/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|