Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1038 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14444 Week
» 67460 Month
» 186987 Year
» 3213840 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
239 |
m/e |
05/1890 |
London and North Eastern Railway |
8253 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68253 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Worsdell |
Class |
J71 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 05/1890 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 16/09/1957 |
Service Life |
67 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1890 |
YK |
|
York (North) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
55E |
|
|
4w/e |
15/12/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/09/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20D |
Normanton |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
LOAN |
20D |
Normanton |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
EXLOAN |
91E |
To Eastern Region |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1890 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 239 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8253 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - York (North) (YK) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68253 |
|
|
15/12/1956 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
16/09/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68253 |
|
|