Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3525 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16931 Week
» 69947 Month
» 189474 Year
» 3216327 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2173 |
m/e |
08/1914 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8690 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68690 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 08/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 20/02/1961 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 6 mths , 20 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1914 |
MID |
|
Middlesbrough |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
51L |
|
Thornaby |
5w/e |
14/06/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
20/02/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51L |
Thornaby |
on |
08/06/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/02/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1914 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2173 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8690 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Middlesbrough (MID) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68690 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
20/02/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68690 |
|
|