Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 324 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18127 Week
» 71143 Month
» 190670 Year
» 3217523 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2183 |
m/e |
10/1914 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8700 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
68700 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 10/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 02/12/1958 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1914 |
KIT |
|
Kittybrewster |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
61C |
|
Keith |
4w/e |
18/02/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/12/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
61C |
Keith |
3w/e |
21/01/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/12/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1914 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2183 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8700 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68700 |
|
|
18/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
02/12/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68700 |
|
|