Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4252 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17658 Week
» 70674 Month
» 190201 Year
» 3217054 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2187 |
m/e |
10/1914 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8704 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
68704 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 10/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 16/10/1961 |
Service Life |
47 yrs , 16 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
SUN |
Sunderland |
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
ALLOC |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
4w/e |
11/06/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/10/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1914 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2187 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8704 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Borough Gardens (BOR) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68704 |
|
|
06/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN) |
|
|
04/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) |
|
|
16/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68704 |
|
|