Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 611 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18414 Week
» 71430 Month
» 190957 Year
» 3217810 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2310 |
m/e |
11/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8717 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
68717 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 11/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 08/11/1961 |
Service Life |
41 yrs , 8 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1920 |
KIT |
|
Kittybrewster |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
66B |
|
Motherwell |
4w/e |
03/06/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/11/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
66B |
Motherwell |
4w/e |
03/06/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
08/11/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
19/03/1950 |
Inverurie Works |
In the yard on 19/3 were 'B.12' No. 61539, 'D.40' No. 62272, 'D.31' No. 62282 (Condemned, built Cowlairs 1890), 'J.36' No. 65294, 'J.72' No. 68717 and '2F' No. 57260 (built Neilson 1884). |
SLS/195004 |
10/02/1962 |
Carnbroe dump |
Carnbroe dump (on former Hamilton NB line adjacent to CR main line): 55201/20/3/65/7/8, 56298/356, 57208/39/68/71/92, 57303/17/9/21/5/63/7/9/89, 57417/8/36/61/3, 57563/4/93, 57632/59/63/5, 68717. |
SLS/196203 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1920 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2310 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8717 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68717 |
|
|
03/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
08/11/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68717 |
|
|