Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 3439 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17482 Week
» 82436 Month
» 285100 Year
» 3311953 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2311 |
m/e |
12/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8718 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68718 |
on |
22/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 12/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 30/06/1958 |
Service Life |
37 yrs , 7 mths |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1920 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2311 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8718 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN) |
|
|
22/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68718 |
|
|
06/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
20/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
22/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
30/06/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68718 |
|
|