Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3270 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16676 Week
» 69692 Month
» 189219 Year
» 3216072 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
516 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8747 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68747 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Works Number |
1626 |
To Service |
During 11/1925 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 23/10/1961 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
4w/e |
26/12/1953 |
ALLOC |
53CALEX |
|
5w/e |
27/02/1954 |
ALLOC |
52B |
Heaton |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
ALLOC |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
4w/e |
26/11/1960 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
23/10/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1950 |
\"A.2\" duties |
The Heaton 'A.2's' Nos. 511 an 515-7 work regularly into Leeds, the 10.10 a.m. Leeds-Liverpool express is invariably worked by one of these engines, 511 and 517 being used most regularly. The return working is the 1.50 p.m. Leeds-Newcastle via York. |
SLS/195102 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 516 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1626 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8747 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68747 |
|
|
19/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
20/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
25/09/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
12/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) |
|
|
23/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68747 |
|
|