Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4379 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17785 Week
» 70801 Month
» 190328 Year
» 3217181 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
69009 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
2090 |
To Service |
During 12/1949 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 18/09/1963 |
Service Life |
13 yrs, 9 mths , 19 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
HLA |
|
on |
16/12/1949 |
ALLOC |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
4w/e |
26/11/1960 |
ALLOC |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
18/09/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 69009 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2090 |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
26/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
18/09/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69009 |
|
|