Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
69022 |
m/e |
04/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
2150 |
To Service |
During 04/1951 to Darlington (51A) |
Withdrawal |
Mon 31/12/1962 |
Service Life |
11 yrs , 9 mths |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
51A |
Darlington |
on |
14/04/1951 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
ALLOC |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
3w/e |
30/09/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
31/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1951 |
North Eastern Sightings |
Seen on a recent tour in the area: New class J 72. 69020 at York; 69021/2/5 in Darlington Shed (Darlington Nos. 2149/50/3 of 1951); 69024 in Blaydon Shed (Darlington No. 2151/51). |
SLS/195106 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 69022 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2150 Allocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
31/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69022 |
|
|