Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 374 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18177 Week
» 71193 Month
» 190720 Year
» 3217573 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
69027 |
m/e |
05/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
J72 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
2155 |
To Service |
During 05/1951 to Heaton (52B) |
Withdrawal |
Mon 22/10/1962 |
Service Life |
11 yrs, 5 mths , 22 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
52B |
Heaton |
on |
08/05/1951 |
ALLOC |
52A |
Gateshead |
4w/e |
21/02/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
22/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 69027 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2155 Allocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
31/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
22/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69027 |
|
|