Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2732 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16138 Week
» 69154 Month
» 188681 Year
» 3215534 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
826 |
m/e |
04/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9826 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8473 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
British Railways |
68473 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J83 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4734 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 26/05/1956 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 1 mth , 25 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1901 |
HAY |
|
Haymarket |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
26/05/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
26/05/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1945 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
06/1945 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
24/08/1947 |
Eastfield MPD |
On 24/8 the locos. on shed ex works were 'J39' 4923/33; 'J83' 8445 and 'J69' 8623, and further locos. ex works during August that have been noted here are: 'K2' 1757; 'J37' 4541/79/84, 4604/17/21; 'J39' 4711, 4818, 4929; 'C15' 7468; 'J88' 8345; 'J83' 8473 (green); 'N15' 9136/77 an 9222. |
SLS/194710 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1901 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 826 Built at Sharp Stewart, Works Number 4734 |
|
|
10/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9826 |
|
|
06/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
17/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8473 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Haymarket (HAY) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68473 |
|
|
26/05/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68473 |
|
|