|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/03/1921 | 27/08/1921 | 177 days | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1923 | 12/01/1924 | 93 days | General | Boiler number 7469 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/01/1925 | 14/03/1925 | 72 days | Heavy | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4646 |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1926 | 03/04/1926 | 79 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/06/1927 | 29/09/1927 | 98 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/05/1929 | 08/06/1929 | 36 days | General | Altered to GE gauge Boiler number 7451 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/02/1931 | 28/03/1931 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7469 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/06/1933 | 29/07/1933 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1935 | 31/08/1935 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7840 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/06/1937 | 24/07/1937 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1939 | 08/04/1939 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/06/1940 | 13/07/1940 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/02/1941 | 01/03/1941 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/10/1942 | 07/11/1942 | 29 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/12/1944 | 03/02/1945 | 47 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/10/1945 | 20/10/1945 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/12/1945 | 05/01/1946 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1946 | 23/08/1946 | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1736 |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 16/09/1946 | 02/11/1946 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 21162 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/12/1948 | 08/02/1949 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 21146 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61736 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 09/07/1949 | 29/10/1949 | 113 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1950 | 09/03/1950 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1950 | 01/12/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/11/1951 | 24/12/1951 | 41 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/02/1953 | 15/03/1953 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 21121 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/05/1955 | 24/06/1955 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
27/08/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 60502/05, 61081, 61727, 1729, 61736/46, 1753, 61759/83/91, 1823, 61876/78, 61988/93, 2428, 62683, 2687, 62688, 3180, 4546/47/64/79, 4703, 64855, 4945/86, 65913, 67478, 68113, 8321, 8477, 68481, 8544, 68955, 69183, 69213, 77306, ex L.M.S. 40170, 44795, 45022, 45451, 54654. During W/E 20/8 Cowlairs started putting the crest on both passenger and goods tender engines which had received a general repair (not intermediate repair) and the following have been noted: Nos. 61308, 61766, 64700 an 90313; no tank engines have so far been noted with the crest-No. 68477 appeared in lined black, with British Railways on the tanks. | SLS/194910 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1646 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1432 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
12/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1923. Dep: 12/01/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7469 (Diagram 3) |
||
02/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 02/01/1925. Dep: 14/03/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4646 |
||
20/06/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
15/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1926. Dep: 03/04/1926. | ||
24/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1927. Dep: 29/09/1927. | ||
04/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1929. Dep: 08/06/1929. Work undertaken: Altered to GE gauge Boiler number 7451 (Diagram 3) |
||
08/06/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
21/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1931. Dep: 28/03/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7469 (Diagram 3) |
||
24/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1933. Dep: 29/07/1933. | ||
27/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1935. Dep: 31/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7840 (Diagram 3) |
||
06/03/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
06/10/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
19/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1937. Dep: 24/07/1937. | ||
18/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1939. Dep: 08/04/1939. | ||
29/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
29/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/06/1940. Dep: 13/07/1940. | ||
08/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1941. Dep: 01/03/1941. | ||
10/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1942. Dep: 07/11/1942. | ||
19/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1944. Dep: 03/02/1945. | ||
17/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/10/1945. Dep: 20/10/1945. | ||
14/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/12/1945. Dep: 05/01/1946. | ||
1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: 23/08/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1736 |
||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
16/06/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
16/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1946. Dep: 02/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21162 (Diagram 3) |
||
01/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1948. Dep: 08/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21146 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61736 |
||
09/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 09/07/1949. Dep: 29/10/1949. | ||
02/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/03/1950. Dep: 09/03/1950. | ||
28/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/11/1950. Dep: 01/12/1950. | ||
07/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
20/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
26/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
14/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1951. Dep: 24/12/1951. | ||
17/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1953. Dep: 15/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21121 (Diagram 3) |
||
17/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/05/1955. Dep: 24/06/1955. | ||
1957 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
07/05/1957 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61736 from Immingham (40B) |