|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 29/03/1922 | 19/08/1922 | 144 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1924 | 21/03/1925 | 143 days | General | Boiler number 7453 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4654 |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/03/1928 | 16/06/1928 | 79 days | General | Altered to GE gauge |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/06/1930 | 02/08/1930 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 7267 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/08/1932 | 08/10/1932 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/07/1934 | 11/08/1934 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1936 | 25/04/1936 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8867 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1938 | 09/04/1938 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1940 | 15/06/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 9201 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/05/1943 | 05/06/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1945 | 03/03/1945 | 22 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/01/1947 | 15/03/1947 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 8860 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 07/12/1949 | 21/01/1950 | 46 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 61744 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/09/1950 | 06/10/1950 | 26 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/01/1952 | 18/02/1952 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 21129 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/02/1955 | 17/03/1955 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/03/1955 | 24/03/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/02/1955 | York Station | 44927 (24E) visited York on 2nd February with an excursion from Blackpool. On the following day 43051 (51D) was at York en route for Doncaster Works, and on 8th February 67748 (34E) was at York bound for Darlington Works with 67720 (34A) proceeding south again after overhaul at Darlington. On 10th February 61078 (38E) was at York returning to the GC section after repair at Darlington and 61141 (38C) arrived in similar circumstances on 12th February. Other unusual visitors to York on 12th February were 78022 on the 9.40 a.m. Sheffield to York (S.O.) and the 1.0 p.m. York to Sheffield (S.O.), 48252 (5B), and 68429 (50C) presumed returning to Selby again after a period of loan to Sunderland. In the northbound direction were 61744 (40F) and 61757 (40F), heading for Cowlairs Works and 90550 (31B) for repair at Darlington. | SLS/195504 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1916 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1654 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1470 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
29/03/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1922. Dep: 19/08/1922. | ||
30/10/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1924. Dep: 21/03/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7453 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4654 |
||
21/02/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
04/12/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV) | ||
12/02/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
30/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1928. Dep: 16/06/1928. Work undertaken: Altered to GE gauge |
||
21/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1930. Dep: 02/08/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7267 (Diagram 3) |
||
31/07/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
25/09/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
20/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1932. Dep: 08/10/1932. | ||
24/06/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
31/08/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
07/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1934. Dep: 11/08/1934. | ||
21/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1936. Dep: 25/04/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8867 (Diagram 3) |
||
05/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1938. Dep: 09/04/1938. | ||
18/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1940. Dep: 15/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9201 (Diagram 3) |
||
21/06/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
08/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1943. Dep: 05/06/1943. | ||
10/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945. | ||
16/04/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
20/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1744 | ||
16/06/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
16/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1947. Dep: 15/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8860 (Diagram 3) |
||
07/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/12/1949. Dep: 21/01/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61744 |
||
11/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/09/1950. Dep: 06/10/1950. | ||
02/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1952. Dep: 18/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21129 (Diagram 3) |
||
16/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/02/1955. Dep: 17/03/1955. | ||
22/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/03/1955. Dep: 24/03/1955. | ||
1957 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
07/01/1957 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61744 from Boston (40F) |