Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 856 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18659 Week
» 71675 Month
» 191202 Year
» 3218055 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1658 |
m/e |
12/1916 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4658 |
|
10/05/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1748 |
|
17/11/1946 |
British Railways |
61748 |
|
30/04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
281 |
Works Number |
1474 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1916 to Ardsley (ARD) |
Withdrawal |
Mon 22/06/1959 off Boston (40F) |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 6 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1960 |
Notes
Notes |
Sold for scrap to Motherwell Machinery & Scrap, Wisham 30/11/59 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LOW |
Lowestoft |
on |
26/03/1947 |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
w/e |
18/10/1947 |
ALLOC |
SL |
South Lynn |
w/e |
29/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
40A |
Lincoln |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
40F |
Boston |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
29/11/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/06/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1916 |
Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7269) |
09/07/1921 |
Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7549) |
31/08/1928 |
Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7457) |
22/03/1930 |
Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 7601) |
30/11/1935 |
Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8861) |
14/03/1942 |
Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 8825) |
02/11/1944 |
Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 9154) |
29/09/1952 |
Diagram 3 boiler fitted (number 21182) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1916 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1658 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1474 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
|
|
09/07/1921 |
Modification |
Diagram 3 number 7549 boiler fitted |
|
|
10/05/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4658 |
|
|
21/02/1928 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
31/08/1928 |
Modification |
Diagram 3 number 7457 boiler fitted |
|
|
22/03/1930 |
Modification |
Diagram 3 number 7601 boiler fitted |
|
|
08/07/1934 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (BOS) |
|
|
23/08/1934 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
30/11/1935 |
Modification |
Diagram 3 number 8861 boiler fitted |
|
|
15/10/1937 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
14/03/1942 |
Modification |
Diagram 3 number 21118 boiler fitted |
|
|
14/03/1942 |
Modification |
Diagram 3 number 8825 boiler fitted |
|
|
02/11/1944 |
Modification |
Diagram 3 number 9154 boiler fitted |
|
|
13/01/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
17/11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1748 |
|
|
26/03/1947 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) |
|
|
13/10/1947 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
26/11/1947 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to South Lynn (SL) |
|
|
30/04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61748 |
|
|
29/09/1952 |
Modification |
Diagram 3 number 21182 boiler fitted |
|
|
13/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
10/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
22/06/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61748 from Boston (40F) |
|
|
1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|