|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 15/11/1922 | 07/05/1923 | 174 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1925 | 09/05/1925 | 93 days | General | Boiler number 7266 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4664 |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1927 | 11/06/1927 | 148 days | General | Altered to GE gauge. Westinghouse brake fitted Boiler number 7840 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1929 | 05/10/1929 | 36 days | General | Front end heating apparatus fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/02/1932 | 02/04/1932 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7839 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/10/1934 | 03/11/1934 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/07/1937 | 24/07/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 21145 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/12/1939 | 06/01/1940 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1942 | 31/10/1942 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 21146 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/01/1943 | 20/02/1943 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/11/1943 | 22/01/1944 | 74 days | General | Boiler number 9345 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/03/1946 | 18/04/1946 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 9472 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 13/04/1947 | 08/05/1947 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/02/1948 | 07/04/1948 | 41 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61754 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/07/1950 | 24/08/1950 | 50 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/09/1950 | 07/09/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/06/1952 | 27/08/1952 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 21179 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 15/05/1954 | 19/06/1954 | 36 days | Light Intermediate | Westinghouse Brake removed |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/05/1956 | 16/06/1956 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 21110 (Diagram 3) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
31/07/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Engines due into Works, July 1950: 61754/71, 1931, 61983, 62208, 62424, 4549/61, 67605/67, 68324, 8450, 69187, 69219, 77230, 90262, 90498. | SLS/195010 |
04/10/1958 | Colwich MPD - stored locomotives | 63729, 63839, 63614, 64976/88, 61739/52/3/4/80, 90005/25/53/288; J50s are going into store as new diesel shunters arrive (D3624/5/6/7 have arrived). | SLS/195811 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1918 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1664 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21975 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
15/11/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1922. Dep: 07/05/1923. | ||
06/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1925. Dep: 09/05/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7266 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4664 |
||
28/05/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
01/01/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
08/01/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
15/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1927. Dep: 11/06/1927. Work undertaken: Altered to GE gauge. Westinghouse brake fitted Boiler number 7840 (Diagram 3) |
||
07/1927 | Modification | Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted | ||
25/07/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
31/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1929. Dep: 05/10/1929. Work undertaken: Front end heating apparatus fitted |
||
12/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E) | ||
31/12/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
27/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1932. Dep: 02/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7839 (Diagram 3) |
||
10/05/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
09/10/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E) | ||
05/08/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
04/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1934. Dep: 03/11/1934. | ||
05/10/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E) | ||
11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
17/12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
04/10/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E) | ||
24/01/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
03/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1937. Dep: 24/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21145 (Diagram 3) |
||
02/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1939. Dep: 06/01/1940. | ||
03/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1942. Dep: 31/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21146 (Diagram 3) |
||
30/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/01/1943. Dep: 20/02/1943. | ||
10/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1943. Dep: 22/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9345 (Diagram 3) |
||
23/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
13/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
03/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1946. Dep: 18/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9472 (Diagram 3) |
||
13/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1754 | ||
26/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) | ||
13/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/04/1947. Dep: 08/05/1947. | ||
17/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
27/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1948. Dep: 07/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61754 |
||
06/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/07/1950. Dep: 24/08/1950. | ||
06/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/09/1950. Dep: 07/09/1950. | ||
23/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1952. Dep: 27/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21179 (Diagram 3) |
||
05/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
15/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 15/05/1954. Dep: 19/06/1954. Work undertaken: Westinghouse Brake removed |
||
03/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1956. Dep: 16/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21110 (Diagram 3) |
||
30/12/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61754 from Colwick (40E) | ||
1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |