|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1921 | 05/11/1921 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1923 | 08/12/1923 | 100 days | General | New chimney to GE gauge |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/12/1925 | 13/03/1926 | 83 days | General | Boiler number 7263 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4674 |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1926 | 27/03/1926 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 1927 | 07/11/1927 | Light Repair | Westinghouse brake fitted Westinghouse Brake fitted |
|||
Doncaster Works | 17/09/1928 | 03/11/1928 | 48 days | General | Westinghouse brake removed Boiler number 7549 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1932 | 07/04/1932 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1934 | 03/05/1934 | General | Speed indicator of cab altered & drop grate fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1935 | 21/12/1935 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 26/06/1937 | 10/08/1937 | 46 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1939 | 26/01/1939 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1939 | 01/05/1939 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1940 | 06/07/1940 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 28/02/1942 | 28/03/1942 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 21128 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1943 | 28/08/1943 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1945 | 20/04/1945 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1946 | 17/10/1946 | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1764 |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 08/04/1946 | 18/05/1946 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 21157 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1947 | 02/07/1947 | Heavy Intermediate | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 28/09/1947 | 20/11/1947 | 54 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1949 | 08/01/1949 | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 61764 |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1950 | 07/01/1950 | Unclassified | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1950 | 07/10/1950 | Unclassified | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 01/05/1950 | 24/06/1950 | 55 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/09/1952 | 18/10/1952 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/05/1954 | 26/06/1954 | 52 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/07/1954 | 15/07/1954 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/08/1954 | 21/08/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/09/1955 | 21/09/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/03/1956 | 05/05/1956 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 21145 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/04/1958 | 24/05/1958 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Further locos. ex Cowlairs Works that have been noted here during November were: Nos. 1728/45, 1764/6 (green, with 1766 snowplough fitted), 2406/31/64/75, 4574, 4605/39, 4817, 4932, 5924, 7465, 8096, 8471, 8957, 9144/62/73. | SLS/194801 |
31/01/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 60152, 61072, 61117/18, 61307, 1751, 61764, 1780, 61784, 2474/76/88, 2684/94, 62733, 3058, 3168, 64575, 4586, 64621/28/36, 4786, 64877/80, 4919/40, 65923, 5924, 65932, 7453/80, 68100, 8323/44, 9170, 9214, 9507, 69595, 90505, ex-W.D. 77089, 77231, 73792. | SLS/195003 |
30/11/1960 | Eastfield MPD | The last two K2s in Scotland, 61764/88, now work freight trains mainly. | SLS/196103 |
06/07/1961 | Eastfield MPD | On 6th July, K2 61764 and D34 62496 were still being used on local duties but 61788 was stored. The Craigendoran-Arrochar service is steam-worked on Summer Saturdays. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1918 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1674 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21985 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
15/10/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/10/1921. Dep: 05/11/1921. | ||
31/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1923. Dep: 08/12/1923. Work undertaken: New chimney to GE gauge |
||
03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
21/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1925. Dep: 13/03/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7263 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4674 |
||
16/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/03/1926. Dep: 27/03/1926. | ||
1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1927. Dep: 07/11/1927. Work undertaken: Westinghouse brake fitted Westinghouse Brake fitted |
||
04/01/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
17/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1928. Dep: 03/11/1928. Work undertaken: Westinghouse brake removed Boiler number 7549 (Diagram 3) |
||
03/11/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
15/03/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Southend Victoria (STR) | ||
22/03/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
11/1931 | Modification | Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed | ||
21/11/1931 | Modification | Diagram 3 number 7606 boiler fitted | ||
21/11/1931 | Modification | Diagram 3 number C1788 boiler fitted | ||
11/12/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1932. Dep: 07/04/1932. | ||
03/1933 | Naming | Named 'LOCH ARKAIG' | ||
1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1934. Dep: 03/05/1934. Work undertaken: Speed indicator of cab altered & drop grate fitted |
||
1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1935. Dep: 21/12/1935. | ||
26/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1937. Dep: 10/08/1937. | ||
07/08/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1939. Dep: 26/01/1939. | ||
1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1939. Dep: 01/05/1939. | ||
1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1940. Dep: 06/07/1940. | ||
28/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1942. Dep: 28/03/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21128 (Diagram 3) |
||
07/12/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1943. Dep: 28/08/1943. | ||
1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1945. Dep: 20/04/1945. | ||
1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: 17/10/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1764 |
||
08/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1946. Dep: 18/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21157 (Diagram 3) |
||
1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: ?/1947. Dep: 02/07/1947. | ||
28/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/09/1947. Dep: 20/11/1947. | ||
1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: ?/1949. Dep: 08/01/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61764 |
||
1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/1950. Dep: 07/01/1950. | ||
1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/1950. Dep: 07/10/1950. | ||
01/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1950. Dep: 24/06/1950. | ||
24/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/09/1952. Dep: 18/10/1952. | ||
06/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 06/05/1954. Dep: 26/06/1954. | ||
08/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/07/1954. Dep: 15/07/1954. | ||
19/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/08/1954. Dep: 21/08/1954. | ||
19/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/09/1955. Dep: 21/09/1955. | ||
19/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1956. Dep: 05/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21145 (Diagram 3) |
||
24/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/04/1958. Dep: 24/05/1958. | ||
1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
07/09/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61764 from Eastfield (65A) |