|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 31/05/1921 | 11/06/1921 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/08/1923 | 03/11/1923 | 81 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/08/1925 | 14/11/1925 | 103 days | General | Boiler number 7455 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/01/1928 | 01/06/1928 | 128 days | General | Boiler number 7253 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1930 | 15/02/1930 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/10/1931 | 05/12/1931 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/09/1933 | 28/10/1933 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7686 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1934 | 14/07/1934 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 8756 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/05/1936 | 27/06/1936 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1939 | 29/04/1939 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/08/1941 | 04/10/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1944 | 25/03/1944 | General | Boiler number 8978 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Stratford Works | 1945 | 19/05/1945 | Light Repair | ||||
Stratford Works | 17/09/1945 | 29/09/1945 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/05/1946 | 15/06/1946 | 31 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1947 | 15/05/1947 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 30/08/1948 | 23/10/1948 | 55 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 61769 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/02/1951 | 19/05/1951 | 89 days | General | Side window cab fitted Boiler number 21171 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/06/1951 | 06/06/1951 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/05/1952 | 17/05/1952 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/04/1953 | 23/05/1953 | 27 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/03/1955 | 30/04/1955 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 21137 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 25/01/1956 | 28/01/1956 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/12/1957 | 11/01/1958 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1918 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1679 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21990 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
31/05/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/05/1921. Dep: 11/06/1921. | ||
15/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1923. Dep: 03/11/1923. | ||
03/03/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4679 | ||
04/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1925. Dep: 14/11/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7455 (Diagram 3) |
||
26/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1928. Dep: 01/06/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7253 (Diagram 3) |
||
18/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1930. Dep: 15/02/1930. | ||
31/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1931. Dep: 05/12/1931. | ||
30/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1933. Dep: 28/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7686 (Diagram 3) |
||
02/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1934. Dep: 14/07/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8756 (Diagram 3) |
||
23/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1936. Dep: 27/06/1936. | ||
25/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1939. Dep: 29/04/1939. | ||
29/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
30/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1941. Dep: 04/10/1941. | ||
04/04/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1944. Dep: 25/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8978 (Diagram 3) |
||
1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1945. Dep: 19/05/1945. | ||
30/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
17/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/09/1945. Dep: 29/09/1945. | ||
02/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
16/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1946. Dep: 15/06/1946. | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
01/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1769 | ||
1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1947. Dep: 15/05/1947. | ||
30/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/08/1948. Dep: 23/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61769 |
||
20/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1951. Dep: 19/05/1951. Work undertaken: Side window cab fitted Boiler number 21171 (Diagram 3) |
||
20/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
26/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to To Scottish Region (91X) | ||
01/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/06/1951. Dep: 06/06/1951. | ||
24/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) | ||
22/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) | ||
05/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/05/1952. Dep: 17/05/1952. | ||
27/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 27/04/1953. Dep: 23/05/1953. | ||
11/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1955. Dep: 30/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21137 (Diagram 3) |
||
25/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/01/1956. Dep: 28/01/1956. | ||
11/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/12/1957. Dep: 11/01/1958. | ||
1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
02/09/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61769 from Parkhead (65C) |