Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2066 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19869 Week
» 72885 Month
» 192412 Year
» 3219265 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
126 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1837 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
61837 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1262 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 01/1925 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 27/04/1962 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 3 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1925 |
IMM |
|
Immingham |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
38A |
|
Colwick |
4w/e |
08/01/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
27/04/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
27/04/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1932 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 126 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1262 |
|
|
07/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1837 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61837 |
|
|
08/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
27/04/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61837 |
|
|