Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 805 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14211 Week
» 67227 Month
» 186754 Year
» 3213607 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1396 |
m/e |
11/1929 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1887 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
61887 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
316 |
Works Number |
1728 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 11/1929 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 02/03/1962 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 4 mths , -1 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1929 |
MAR |
|
March |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
36A |
|
Doncaster |
4w/e |
22/09/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/03/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
13/10/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/03/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1932 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
04/1932 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1396 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1728 |
|
|
04/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1887 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61887 |
|
|
22/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
02/03/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61887 |
|
|