|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/03/1950 | Loco renumbering anomalies | No. 68370 was seen renumbered by 8/1/49 even though offical notification has only just come through. 61943 was at Neasden on 25/3/50. So far as we are aware, the transfer of 69930 to Stratford on 16/4 is interesting as being the first Q.1 to be stationed there. | SLS/195006 |
02/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shops) | New Erecting Shop: D2394/5, E3064-9. Boiler Shop: E3070. Stripping Road: D2235, D3446, D3694, 60022, 60502/19, 61195, 61311. 61902/19, 64170, 70018/39. Scrap Yard: 61997 being cut up. Crimpsall: 61157, 61846. Outside Crimpsall: D3660, 61056/87, 76050. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D2402, D3449, D5571/2, D8211, 12124, 13253, 43154, 60009/30/62/73/7, 60142/55/6, 61074, 61167, 61378, 61893, 61906/43, 63928, 70009/23/7/35. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60029, 61231, 61850/65, 68591. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: D5534, 60099, 62059, 63967. Paint Shop: D2393, D6720, D9006, E3062/3, 13252, 60161, 61120. Outside Paint Shop: D351, D5347, D5804, D6719. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196108 |
31/10/1962 | Colwick MPD | K3s 61943/82 (transferred to Stationary boiler stock) are at Colwick on these duties. | SLS/196212 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2438 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24229 |
||
09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1943 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
18/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
01/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61943 | ||
24/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
23/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
14/12/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
12/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61943 | ||
1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Ickles |