Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 962 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18765 Week
» 71781 Month
» 191308 Year
» 3218161 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3826 |
m/e |
01/1937 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1986 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
61986 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1696 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 01/1937 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 28/05/1962 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 4 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
HTN |
Heaton |
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
ALLOC |
51L |
Thornaby |
5w/e |
31/12/1960 |
ALLOC |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
5w/e |
08/07/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
28/05/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1937 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3826 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1696 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1986 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61986 |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
10/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) |
|
|
24/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
28/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61986 |
|
|