Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 2985 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16391 Week
» 69407 Month
» 188934 Year
» 3215787 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways (1st) |
69015 |
on |
16/04/1948 |
British Railways |
67716 |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
E. Thompson |
Class |
L1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
2034 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
Sun 16/04/1948 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
14 yrs , 5 mths |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
16/04/1948 |
32B |
|
Ipswich |
w/e |
14/05/1950 |
32B |
|
Ipswich |
3w/e |
31/05/1950 |
30A |
|
Stratford |
w/e |
17/01/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
STR |
Stratford |
on |
16/04/1948 |
ALLOC |
32B |
Ipswich |
w/e |
14/05/1950 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
24/01/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1961 |
Stratford Works (Old Works) |
New Erecting Shop: D204, D5041/3/72/95, D5515/6/62, D5625, D5907, D8216, D8403/8. Outside New Erecting Shop: D206, D5050/1, D5588, D5634, D5905. Old Works: 43105, 64697, 65460/2, 67716, 69646, 69730. Old Works Yard: 65465, 67701, 68538, 69713. Scrap Road: 68578, 69656, Works Shunters : DEPT32/44/5. |
SLS/196106 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/04/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 69015 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2034 |
|
|
15/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67716 |
|
|
14/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
17/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67716 |
|
|