|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1954 | York MPD | During this period the South shed was temporarily reopened while repairs were being effected to the turntable in No. 4 roundhouse at the North shed. New Standard Class 3 2-6-0's from Swindon 77002 and 77003 called at York on 17/3/54 and 19/3/54 respectively en route for Darlington. The following Ll 2-6-4T's called at York en route from the south to Darlington Works for repair: 67792 (34E)-19/3/54, 67718 (34E)-29/3/54, 67756-9/4/54. On this latter date 67753 (34B) passed through York resplendent ex-Darlington Works, and likewise 67764 (53B) and 67795 (34E) on 20/4/54. J71 68296 (53A) and 68242 (53A) passed through York ex-Darlington Works on 19/3/54 and 12/4/54 respectively en route for Hull. On 9/4/54 J71 68238 (20D) was at York with rods 'down' while proceeding from Normanton to Darlington Works, and similarly 69104 (53A) from Hull to Darlington on 20/4/54. Another unusual visitor was 60509 (64B) en route from the Scottish Region to Doncaster Works on 28/4/54. 90439 (35A) was under repair at York shed on 29/3/54. | SLS/195406 |
29/01/1961 | New England (In store) | 60506/8 were in steam on SLS Visit on 29/1/61- 60504 was withdrawn 17/1/61. K2 61742 (from Boston) has replaced 61763 as stationary boiler. In store are L1s 67717/8/21/32/8 for LMR Gorton, and 67778/95/6/8 ex LMR Gorton. | SLS/196103 |
14/01/1962 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/05/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 67718 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2036 |
||
06/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
19/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
30/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
21/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
16/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
25/12/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) | ||
19/03/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
14/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
03/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
07/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
18/11/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 67718 |