|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 28/04/1917 | 16/06/1917 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1921 | 16/04/1921 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1923 | 10/11/1923 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 492 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1924 | 17/01/1925 | 43 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5274 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/05/1928 | 23/06/1928 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/05/1931 | 06/06/1931 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 334 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1935 | 08/06/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 988 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1938 | 03/09/1938 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 590 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1941 | 10/01/1942 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 687 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/03/1944 | 22/04/1944 | 41 days | General | Heating apparatus removed Boiler number 649 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1946 | 20/04/1946 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 683 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/08/1947 | 23/08/1947 | 15 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 05/06/1948 | 26/06/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3105 (Diagram 14) Renumbered to BR 69052 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/07/1949 | 30/07/1949 | 9 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 05/08/1950 | 26/08/1950 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3134 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1952 | 09/02/1952 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22016 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/08/1953 | 05/09/1953 | 29 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
21/12/1952 | Northwich MPD | It was confirmed, when this shed was visited on the shortest day of the year, that 45 locomotives are housed there. Among these are a dozen '8F's'; eight 'J.10's' and five 'D.10's.' For working the heavily graded Winnington mineral branch, only one L.3 2-6-4 tank remains (69052); it is assisted on similar duties by two recently drafted 'Super-D' 0-8-0's (49405 and 49435). Both the latter have been fitted with tender cabs for backward running. The remaining locomotives at Northwich comprise a number of 'standard class 4' 0-6-0's; one D.11 and one or two other oddments. | SLS/195302 |
12/09/1953 | Northwich MPD | The following Class J.10 0-6-0's were on the shed at 10 p.m., 65134, 65139, 65165, 65156, 65158, 65169 an 65202. Class D.10 4-4-0, 62659 Worsley Taylor, was at the end of No. 3 road, inside the shed minus her tender, with D.11, 62669 Ypres, on the adjoining road. Only one 'Super-D' (49435) was present. The balance of the inhabitants was made up of '8F's', a few Class 4 0-6-0's, a '3F' 0-6-0 and one N.5 0-6-2T, Number 69255. No O.4's were in evidence. Ex.G.C. 2-6-4 tank 69052 has returned to Northwich shed as from 20/9, having had a reprieve from scrapping. From 21/9, the whole of the working of limestone traffic between Tunstead and Northwich has been entrusted to Northwich shed, instead of being shared with Heaton Mersey. This will result in the saving of seven sets of men and nearly 1,500 miles of 'light engine' running annually. Three additional 8F's have been allocated to 9E for the new rosters. | SLS/195311 |
24/04/1954 | Northwich MPD | No major changes were noted at this depot on 24th April. No 69052 has recently been to Gorton for overhaul, and has evidently developed some further defect, since she was suspended from the bunker end under the sheerlegs. It was interesting to discern quite distinctly under the coat of paint on the tender sides of 48046, the letters 'W.D.' with the broad arrow between. Two engines of class D10 were on the shed, 62659 'Worsley Taylor' and 62653 'Sir Edward Fraser,' while 62656 'Sir Clement Royds' was working the 3.40 p.m. Manchester-Chester train. Dll 62669 'Ypres' was still under repair at the back of the shed. | SLS/195405 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1915 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 274 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 14 boiler fitted |
||
28/04/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1917. Dep: 16/06/1917. | ||
08/11/1919 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
12/03/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1921. Dep: 16/04/1921. | ||
10/03/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
25/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1923. Dep: 10/11/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 492 (Diagram 14) |
||
06/12/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1924. Dep: 17/01/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5274 |
||
31/01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
05/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1928. Dep: 23/06/1928. | ||
28/03/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
29/06/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
02/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1931. Dep: 06/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 334 (Diagram 14) |
||
18/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1935. Dep: 08/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 988 (Diagram 14) |
||
30/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1938. Dep: 03/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 590 (Diagram 14) |
||
02/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1941. Dep: 10/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 687 (Diagram 14) |
||
06/08/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
19/01/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shoeburyness (13D) | ||
13/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1944. Dep: 22/04/1944. Work undertaken: Heating apparatus removed Boiler number 649 (Diagram 14) |
||
09/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
09/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1946. Dep: 20/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 683 (Diagram 14) |
||
12/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shoeburyness (13D) | ||
20/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9052 | ||
09/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/08/1947. Dep: 23/08/1947. | ||
05/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1948. Dep: 26/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3105 (Diagram 14) Renumbered to BR 69052 |
||
22/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/07/1949. Dep: 30/07/1949. | ||
05/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1950. Dep: 26/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3134 (Diagram 14) |
||
12/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1952. Dep: 09/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22016 (Diagram 14) |
||
08/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/08/1953. Dep: 05/09/1953. | ||
09/08/1954 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69052 from Northwich (9G) |