|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 08/03/1919 | 07/06/1919 | 92 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/01/1922 | 22/04/1922 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 1559 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/05/1925 | 11/07/1925 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5344 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/12/1928 | 16/02/1929 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1674 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/05/1931 | 04/07/1931 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 60 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/08/1936 | 03/10/1936 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 657 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1941 | 25/10/1941 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 3105 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/04/1944 | 20/05/1944 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 611 (Diagram 14) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/01/1946 | 09/02/1946 | 23 days | Light Repair | After collision |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1916 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 344 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 14 boiler fitted |
||
08/03/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1919. Dep: 07/06/1919. | ||
08/11/1919 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
28/01/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1922. Dep: 22/04/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1559 (Diagram 14) |
||
02/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1925. Dep: 11/07/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5344 |
||
29/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1928. Dep: 16/02/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1674 (Diagram 14) |
||
11/05/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
30/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1931. Dep: 04/07/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 60 (Diagram 14) |
||
01/08/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
18/10/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
27/12/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
10/02/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
29/12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
22/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1936. Dep: 03/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 657 (Diagram 14) |
||
02/02/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
03/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1941. Dep: 25/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3105 (Diagram 14) |
||
27/09/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
04/08/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
31/01/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
15/02/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
21/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
14/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1944. Dep: 20/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 611 (Diagram 14) |
||
18/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/01/1946. Dep: 09/02/1946. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9063 | ||
10/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
25/07/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 9063 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF) |