Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 4086 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17492 Week
» 70508 Month
» 190035 Year
» 3216888 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1731 |
m/e |
01/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4731 |
m/e |
02/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9510 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
British Railways |
69510 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L734 |
Works Number |
22587 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Vacuum |
|
To Service |
During 01/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 04/11/1959 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 10 mths , 4 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1921 |
PKD |
|
Parkhead |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
65E |
|
Kipps |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
65C |
|
Parkhead |
8w/e |
19/04/1952 |
64G |
|
Hawick |
4w/e |
16/02/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
04/11/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65E |
Kipps |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
ALLOC |
65C |
Parkhead |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
ALLOC |
64G |
Hawick |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1927 |
Condensers removed |
06/1928 |
Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake |
04/1947 |
Vacuum |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/06/1949 |
Cowlairs Works |
Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 60503/06, 61002, 1260/1/2, 1742/66/93, 61998, 2402/40/60, 4594, 4617/26, 4818/58, 65933, 7480/91, 67631, 8104, 9209, 69500/10, 9553, 69565, Class '8' 73799, 77031, 77431/42/76, ex L.M.S. Nos. 44994, 16156. |
SLS/194907 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1731 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22587 |
|
|
02/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4731 |
|
|
10/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
06/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake |
|
|
24/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9510 |
|
|
04/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69510 |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kipps (65E) |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
16/02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hawick (64G) |
|
|
04/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69510 |
|
|