Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3326 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16732 Week
» 69748 Month
» 189275 Year
» 3216128 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
631 |
m/e |
04/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5631 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N4 |
Company History |
MSLR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
E661 |
Works Number |
4118 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1891 |
Withdrawal |
During 06/1932 |
Service Life |
41 yrs , 2 mths |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1891 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
06/1932 |
YK |
|
York (North) |
w/e |
10/01/1948 |
MAL |
|
Malton |
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
50G |
|
Whitby |
w/e |
01/10/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
YK |
York (North) |
w/e |
10/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
MAL |
Malton |
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
ALLOC |
50G |
Whitby |
w/e |
01/10/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/11/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1911 |
Saturated Diagram 21 Boiler Fitted |
06/1911 |
Diagram 21 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1891 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 631 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 4118 Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
06/1911 |
Modification |
Diagram 21 boiler fitted |
|
|
06/1911 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated Diagram 21 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
01/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5631 |
|
|
06/1932 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5631 |
|
|
10/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
29/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Malton (MAL) |
|
|
01/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Whitby (50G) |
|
|