Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 412 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18215 Week
» 71231 Month
» 190758 Year
» 3217611 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
520 |
m/e |
09/1893 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5520 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9255 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
69255 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3554 |
To Service |
During 09/1893 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 16/06/1956 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 9 mths , 16 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
9G |
Northwich |
4w/e |
23/04/1955 |
ALLOC |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
16/06/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1932 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/09/1953 |
Northwich MPD |
The following Class J.10 0-6-0's were on the shed at 10 p.m., 65134, 65139, 65165, 65156, 65158, 65169 an 65202. Class D.10 4-4-0, 62659 Worsley Taylor, was at the end of No. 3 road, inside the shed minus her tender, with D.11, 62669 Ypres, on the adjoining road. Only one 'Super-D' (49435) was present. The balance of the inhabitants was made up of '8F's', a few Class 4 0-6-0's, a '3F' 0-6-0 and one N.5 0-6-2T, Number 69255. No O.4's were in evidence. Ex.G.C. 2-6-4 tank 69052 has returned to Northwich shed as from 20/9, having had a reprieve from scrapping. From 21/9, the whole of the working of limestone traffic between Tunstead and Northwich has been entrusted to Northwich shed, instead of being shared with Heaton Mersey. This will result in the saving of seven sets of men and nearly 1,500 miles of 'light engine' running annually. Three additional 8F's have been allocated to 9E for the new rosters. |
SLS/195311 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 520 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3554 |
|
|
08/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5520 |
|
|
09/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9255 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69255 |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (9G) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69255 |
|
|