Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1832 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19635 Week
» 72651 Month
» 192178 Year
» 3219031 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
528 |
m/e |
10/1893 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5528 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9262 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
69262 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3562 |
To Service |
During 10/1893 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 22/12/1959 |
Service Life |
66 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1932 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 528 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3562 |
|
|
12/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5528 |
|
|
02/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9262 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Northwich (NTH) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69262 |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
03/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
22/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69262 |
|
|