Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 371 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18174 Week
» 71190 Month
» 190717 Year
» 3217570 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
917 |
m/e |
06/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5917 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9341 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
69341 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
To Service |
During 06/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/12/1959 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 6 mths , 11 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1900 |
NEA |
|
Neasden |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
14D |
Neasden |
on |
01/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
14D |
Neasden |
on |
23/02/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1932 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 917 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5917 |
|
|
11/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9341 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69341 |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69341 |
|
|