Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1131 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14537 Week
» 67553 Month
» 187080 Year
» 3213933 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
930 |
m/e |
05/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5930 |
m/e |
02/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9354 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
69354 |
m/e |
03/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
4190 |
To Service |
During 05/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 12/02/1960 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 9 mths , 13 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1933 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 930 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4190 |
|
|
02/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5930 |
|
|
02/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9354 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
03/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69354 |
|
|
21/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
17/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
20/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) |
|
|
09/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) |
|
|
12/02/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69354 |
|
|