Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2021 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19824 Week
» 72840 Month
» 192367 Year
» 3219220 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
990E |
m/e |
12/1923 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7990 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9612 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
British Railways |
69612 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
N7 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
K89 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 12/1923 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 03/08/1959 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 8 mths , 4 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
4w/e |
23/06/1956 |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
03/08/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1936 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1923 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 990 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7990 |
|
|
07/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9612 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69612 |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
03/08/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69612 |
|
|