Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1361 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19164 Week
» 72180 Month
» 191707 Year
» 3218560 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2638 |
m/e |
01/1928 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9678 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
69678 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
N7 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Gorton Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 01/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 10/09/1961 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
3w/e |
28/07/1951 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
w/e |
29/09/1951 |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
w/e |
17/11/1951 |
ALLOC |
34C |
Hatfield |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
03/09/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/09/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1936 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1928 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2638 Built at Gorton Works |
|
|
11/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9678 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69678 |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
28/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
29/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
17/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
20/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
27/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69678 |
|
|