Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 3952 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17995 Week
» 82949 Month
» 285613 Year
» 3312466 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2650 |
m/e |
08/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9690 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
69690 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
N7 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
313 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 08/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 13/01/1961 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 5 mths , 13 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1935 |
Condensers removed |
06/1949 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1961 |
Stratford Works (foundry) |
Steam locomotives-Old Works: 68633; waiting cut-up 67726, 68924; foundry 68612, 69690 |
SLS/196109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2650 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 313 |
|
|
07/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9690 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hatfield (HAT) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69690 |
|
|
06/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
09/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
15/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
22/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
20/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
16/08/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
18/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
07/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
13/01/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69690 |
|
|