Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1326 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19129 Week
» 72145 Month
» 191672 Year
» 3218525 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2660 |
m/e |
09/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9700 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
69700 |
m/e |
01/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
N7 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
323 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 09/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 04/12/1960 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 3 mths , 3 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
IPS |
Ipswich |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
w/e |
14/05/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/12/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1933 |
Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
07/1936 |
Condensers removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1961 |
Stratford MPD (30A) (On shed withdrawn) |
On shed withdrawn: 64652, 67701/6/8/9/36, 68899, 69679/82/700/8. |
SLS/196109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2660 Built at Beardmore, Dalmuir, Glasgow, Works Number 323 |
|
|
07/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
|
07/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9700 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
23/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
14/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
01/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69700 |
|
|
04/12/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69700 |
|
|