Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 702 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14108 Week
» 67124 Month
» 186651 Year
» 3213504 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2607 |
m/e |
12/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9709 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
69709 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
N7 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
310 |
Works Number |
1676 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 12/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 01/11/1960 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 11 mths , 2 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
4w/e |
26/03/1949 |
ALLOC |
34C |
Hatfield |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
ALLOC |
30E |
Colchester |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
05/10/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/11/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1936 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2607 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1676 |
|
|
10/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9709 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69709 |
|
|
26/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
19/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
01/11/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69709 |
|
|